+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 443.
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On June 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
- In Senate.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 853.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Amended notice of eligibility: Exempt.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
May 28, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor