+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 399.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment Nos. 917, 932 and 964 concurred in.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 917.) To printer.
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 932.) To printer.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 964.) To printer.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint .
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 365.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On December 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On December 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
April 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 17
April 3, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor