+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To printer.
- Exemption effective.
- Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 517.)
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On April 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Operations and Elections
Type:
Primary Sponsor