+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 313.
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 22, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor