+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 289.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee. Notice of exemption.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor