+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of exemption.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor