+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 483.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1043.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To printer.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 15.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To committee.
On November 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor