+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor