+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 558.
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. Senate Amendment No. 1105 concurred in. To enrollment.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1105.) To printer.
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 949.) To printer.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor