+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 538.
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 827 receded from. To Assembly. In Assembly. To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. To enrollment.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 827 not concurred in. To Senate. In Senate.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 827.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) Action reconsidered. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 417.) To printer.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor