+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
- Taken from General File.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor