+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended. Placed on General File. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Notice of eligibility for exemption. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 310.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor