+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment Nos. 924 and 942 concurred in.
- Action of refusal to concur in Senate Amendment No. 942 reconsidered.
- Action of refusal to concur in Senate Amendment No. 924 reconsidered.
- Senate Amendment Nos. 924 and 942 not concurred in.
On June 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On June 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 942.) To printer.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 924.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
- In Senate.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 778.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
May 24, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor