+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 11.
On April 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
On March 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Growth and Infrastructure
Type:
Primary Sponsor