+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 369 and 538.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On March 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.