+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 851.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Senate Amendment Nos. 775 and 851 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To committee.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 775.) Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 673.) To printer.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 146.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On April 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor