+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 262.) To printer.
On April 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.