+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor. Chapter 432.
On June 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1036.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of exemption.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.