+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 294.
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 780 concurred in.
- In Assembly.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 780.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 624.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
May 22, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 19
May 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
April 21, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 42
April 8, 2015: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 18
February 18, 2015: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor