+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 159.
On May 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor. Approved by the Governor.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 516.) To printer.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.