+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 480.
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 895 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 895.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 411.) To printer.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor