+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 358.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment Nos. 803 and 925 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To Assembly.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 925.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To printer.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 803.) To printer.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 634.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 8, Excused: 2.) To printer.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 384.) To printer.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Assemblywoman Selena Torres
Type:
Primary Sponsor