+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 396.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.