+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 388.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 847.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Senate Amendment No. 847 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. Action of referral rescinded. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
On May 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 789.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On April 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Waiver granted effective: April 8, 2021.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee. Rereferred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor