+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 365.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 8, Absent: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 672.) To printer.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On April 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor