+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 304.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor