+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 18.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On March 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On March 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor