+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 306.
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment Nos. 694 and 839 concurred in.
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 839.) To printer.
- Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 694.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 386.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 23, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor