+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 677 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 677.) To printer.
On April 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 522.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To printer.
On April 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 88.) To printer.
On March 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee. Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On March 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor