+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 185.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. Action of placement on General File for next legislative day rescinded. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor