+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 33.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 76.) To printer.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- To committee.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer.
On November 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assembly Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor