+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 359.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment No. 586 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 586.) To printer.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 472.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To printer.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 195.) To printer. From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor