+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 631.
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1028.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 4, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To printer. From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
On April 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 363.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor