+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On April 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2019.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor