+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On June 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On June 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 895 and 903.) To printer.
On April 25, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
On April 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 376.) To printer.
On March 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor