+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 306.) To printer.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (6)
Assemblyman Alexander Assefa
Type:
Primary Sponsor