+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Secretary's desk.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 720.) Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. To printer.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 17.) To Senate.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 491.) To printer.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor