+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 359.
On June 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To enrollment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 801 concurred in.
On May 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 801.) To printer.
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
- Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
- In Senate.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 401.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2013: Senate Final Passage
- Yeas: 21
April 18, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor