+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
- (No further action taken.)
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- To printer.
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
- Dispensed with reprinting.
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 982.)
- Placed on General File.
- From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
- To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
- Exemption effective.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 507.) To printer.
- Placed on Second Reading File.
- From Concurrent Committee on Taxation: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committees.
On March 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Taxation and Ways and Means. To printer.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
June 3, 2013: Assembly Final Passage
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor