+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 235.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor