+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 526.
On June 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on General File.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 948.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 12, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To printer.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 570.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor