+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor. Chapter 381.
On June 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 841.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To printer.
On April 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Exempt pursuant to subsection 4 of Joint Standing Rule 14.6.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor