+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 476.
On June 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. In Assembly. To enrollment.
On June 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
On May 29, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass, as amended. Placed on General File. Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
On April 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 70.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On April 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor