+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On March 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of exemption.
On March 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor