+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 19.
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 19, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time.
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
On April 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time.
On April 3, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass.
On March 10, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor