+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 627.
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate Amendment No. 738 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 738.) To printer.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Taken from General File. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 642.) Dispensed with reprinting. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 11, Excused: 2.) To printer.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 618.) To printer.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Assemblywoman Selena Torres
Type:
Primary Sponsor