+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Bill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
On May 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Senate Amendment No. 773 concurred in. To enrollment.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 773.) To printer.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 11.) To Senate.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 518.) To printer. From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 556.) To printer.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor