+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 490.
On June 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1103.) Reprinting dispensed with. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To Assembly. In Assembly. Senate Amendment Nos. 1086 and 1103 concurred in. To enrollment.
On June 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1086.) To printer. From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 972.) To printer.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on Second Reading File. Notice of eligibility for exemption. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 501.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.
+ − Sponsor
Assemblywoman Sarah Peters
Type:
Primary Sponsor