+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chapter 529.
On June 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
On June 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. To enrollment.
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
On May 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Placed on General File. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 978.) To printer.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Notice of eligibility for exemption. Placed on Second Reading File. Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 364.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
On March 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Assemblywoman Sarah Peters
Type:
Primary Sponsor