+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (No further action taken.)
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. In Senate. Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 977.) To printer.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee. Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Notice of eligibility for exemption.
On March 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. To committee.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.